This case was last updated from Kiowa County Courts on 11/10/2022 at 06:05:18 (UTC).

IN RE: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR EDWARD DODD AND MELISSA DODD

Case Summary

On 12/21/2021 IN RE FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR EDWARD DODD AND MELISSA DODD was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Kiowa County Courts, Kiowa County Courthouse located in Seminole, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is MARSH, RICKY A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0047

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Kiowa, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

MARSH, RICKY A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DODD, EDWARD

Defendant

DODD, MELISSA

 

Court Documents

FILED & ENTER PETITION

12/21/2021: FILED & ENTER PETITION

FILED ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

12/30/2021: FILED ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

FILED AMENDED PETITION FOR DIVORCE

01/24/2022: FILED AMENDED PETITION FOR DIVORCE

FILED DECREE OF DIVORCE

01/24/2022: FILED DECREE OF DIVORCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • HearingEvent: DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED DECREE OF DIVORCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED AMENDED PETITION FOR DIVORCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 6.56

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.04

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM ASSESSMENT (NEW 7-1-04); Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 183.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less