This case was last updated from Cherokee County Courts on 07/17/2021 at 20:47:46 (UTC).

IN RE: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR DAYNA LEE MABRAY AND NICK ALLEN MABRAY

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 IN RE FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR DAYNA LEE MABRAY AND NICK ALLEN MABRAY was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Cherokee County Courts, Cherokee County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is KING, JOSHUA C.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0161

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Cherokee, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

KING, JOSHUA C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MABRAY, DAYNA LEE

Defendant

MABRAY, NICK ALLEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SEACAT, ROBERT V.

3220 S Peoria Ave Ste 203

Tulsa, OK 74105

GARCIA, LISA M.

Legal Advocates For Indian Countrypo Box 973

Wagoner, OK 74477

 

Court Documents

PETITIONER'S AMENDED APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS

12/13/2018: PETITIONER'S AMENDED APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS

RESPONSE TO AMENDED APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER

12/26/2018: RESPONSE TO AMENDED APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER

MO 5/17APPEARANCES:RSEACAT/PET,SJONES/RESP.IA ON

05/17/2021: MO 5/17APPEARANCES:RSEACAT/PET,SJONES/RESP.IA ON

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • HearingEvent: KING AM DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SANCTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOTION FOR VISITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SETTING PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: COOPERATE WITH DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • HearingEvent: KING PM DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: TRIAL SET 7-21-21 9AM.JKING

    Read MoreRead Less
216 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketDescription: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketDescription: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketDescription: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketDescription: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketDescription: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketDescription: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketDescription: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketDescription: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketDescription: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketDescription: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less