This case was last updated from Creek County Courts on 06/14/2022 at 08:54:31 (UTC).

IN RE: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR CORY A. EMMONS AND RACHEL M. EMMONS

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 IN RE FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR CORY A EMMONS AND RACHEL M EMMONS was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Creek County Courts, Creek County Courthouse - Sapulpa Division located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is HAMMERS, PAMELA B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0102

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Creek, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

HAMMERS, PAMELA B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EMMONS, CORY A.

Defendant

EMMONS, RACHEL M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

THOMPSON, G. GENE

101 E Lee

Sapulpa, OK 74066

PALACIOS, KERI D

Creek County Law, 101 E Lee Ave

Sapulpa, OK 74066

MCCASKEY, CHARLES C

Creek County Law, 101 E Lee Ave

Sapulpa, OK 74066

CREEK COUNTY LAW PLLC

Attorney at CREEK COUNTY LAW PLLC

101 E Lee Ave

Sapulpa, OK 74066

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

05/17/2022: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

ENTRY OF APPEARACE: CREEK COUNTY LAW FOR THE PETITIONER

05/17/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARACE: CREEK COUNTY LAW FOR THE PETITIONER

APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS

05/17/2022: APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2022
  • HearingEvent: PH: DOMESTIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 7-21-22 @ 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS - SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARACE: CREEK COUNTY LAW FOR THE PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED TO RACHEL M. EMMONS- RETURNED TO ATTY; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL INTERPRETER TRANSLATOR; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCASKEY, CHARLES C.