This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/30/2022 at 06:59:19 (UTC).

IN RE: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR CONOLY LEE DUNN AND LINDA LOUIS DUNN

Case Summary

On 06/17/2021 IN RE FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR CONOLY LEE DUNN AND LINDA LOUIS DUNN was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Seminole County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is BUTNER, HONORABLE BRETT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0043

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

BUTNER, HONORABLE BRETT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUNN, CONOLY LEE

Defendant

DUNN, LINDA LOUIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WILSON, GREG S.

Attorney at WILSON LAW FIRM, PLLC

502 North Broadway

Shawnee, OK 74801

MILLER, MARIANNE

935 N Kickapoo, P.O. Box 1095

Shawnee, OK 74802

 

Court Documents

PETITION APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER

06/17/2021: PETITION APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER

ISSUED SUMMONS FOR LINDA LOUIS DUNN

06/17/2021: ISSUED SUMMONS FOR LINDA LOUIS DUNN

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - GREG WILSON

06/17/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - GREG WILSON

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS AND NOTICE OF AUTOMATIVE TEMPORARY INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COUNTER APPLICATION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 2.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.18

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILSON, GREG S