This case was last updated from Kingfisher County Courts on 05/11/2022 at 06:07:28 (UTC).

IN RE: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR CHIRISTIN ABAGAIL GARDNER AND LANE EDWARD GARDNER

Case Summary

On 06/26/2018 IN RE FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR CHIRISTIN ABAGAIL GARDNER AND LANE EDWARD GARDNER was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Kingfisher County Courts, Kingfisher County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHNEITER, LANCE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0027

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Kingfisher, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

SCHNEITER, LANCE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARDNER, CHIRISTIN ABAGAIL

Defendant

GARDNER, LANE EDWARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WALTA, PHYLLIS L

120 E Oklahoma

Hennessey, OK 73742

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • HearingEvent: FINAL DECREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • HearingEvent: DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FINAL DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PER DECREE.SE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DOES NOT APPEAR. TESTIMONY TAKEN. DIVORCE GRANTED AS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM - PLAIN WITH WALTA. DEFENDANT FILED WAIVER AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AS TO CHIRSTIN A GARDNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DIEPC: PARTY COMPLETED DIVORCE IMPACT EDUCATIONAL PROG.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 7/1/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION - DIVORCE; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less