This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 04/09/2023 at 21:32:44 (UTC).

IN RE: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR CARLA LONG AND TONY MARK LONG

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 IN RE FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR CARLA LONG AND TONY MARK LONG was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Pottawatomie, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is MCDANIEL, TRACY L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0013

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

MCDANIEL, TRACY L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LONG, CARLA

Defendant

LONG, TONY MARK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PETERS LAW PLLC

SUTTON, PAUL

 

Court Documents

FILE PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

01/12/2023: FILE PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

FILE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS

01/12/2023: FILE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS

FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE PAUL SUTTON ON BEHALF OF THE

02/01/2023: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE PAUL SUTTON ON BEHALF OF THE

FILE ANSWER, CROSS-PETITION AND APPLICATION FOR

02/14/2023: FILE ANSWER, CROSS-PETITION AND APPLICATION FOR

FILE ANSWER TO RESPONDENT'S CROSS-PETITION

03/07/2023: FILE ANSWER TO RESPONDENT'S CROSS-PETITION

 

Docket Entries

03/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ANSWER TO RESPONDENT'S CROSS-PETITION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: TEMPORARY ORDERS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ANSWER, CROSS-PETITION AND APPLICATION FOR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RESPONDENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE PAUL SUTTON ON BEHALF OF THE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE SUMMONS- TONY LONG; Amount: $ 10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CHSC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Amount: $ 183.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less