This case was last updated from McCurtain County Courts on 06/17/2022 at 18:54:07 (UTC).

IN RE: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR BRENDA CUNNINGHAM AND LARRY CUNNINGHAM

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 IN RE FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR BRENDA CUNNINGHAM AND LARRY CUNNINGHAM was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in McCurtain County Courts, McCurtain County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is FARLEY, KENNETH R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0057

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    McCurtain, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

FARLEY, KENNETH R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CUNNINGHAM, BRENDA

Defendant

CUNNINGHAM, LARRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MILLER, J. MICHAEL

323 1/2 E. Carl Albert Pkwy

Mcalester, OK 74502

 

Court Documents

DISSOLUTION PETITION

05/20/2022: DISSOLUTION PETITION

SUMMONS AND RETURN - SERVED LC

05/26/2022: SUMMONS AND RETURN - SERVED LC

ANSWER

06/06/2022: ANSWER

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2022
  • HearingEvent: MD - TEMPORARY ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS AND RETURN - SERVED LC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE SUMMONS; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL FUND INTERPRETER FUND; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/07; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISSOLUTION PETITION; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less