This case was last updated from Choctaw County Courts on 04/22/2022 at 23:24:58 (UTC).

IN RE: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR BRANDI GREGORY AND JEREMY L GREGORY

Case Summary

On 10/27/2021 IN RE FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR BRANDI GREGORY AND JEREMY L GREGORY was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Choctaw County Courts, Choctaw County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is BAZE, BILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0049

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Choctaw, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

BAZE, BILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREGORY, BRANDI

Defendant

GREGORY, JEREMY L

 

Court Documents

FILE & ENTER PETITION

10/27/2021: FILE & ENTER PETITION

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

11/01/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

MINUTE ORDER, MATTER SET DECEMBER 7, 2021 AT 9:30

11/03/2021: MINUTE ORDER, MATTER SET DECEMBER 7, 2021 AT 9:30

DECREE OF DIVORCE AND DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

12/07/2021: DECREE OF DIVORCE AND DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2021
  • HearingEvent: FINAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER (Civil,Divorce,S.C.,Adop.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DECREE OF DIVORCE AND DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: O'CLOCK A.M. FOR FINAL DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MINUTE ORDER, MATTER SET DECEMBER 7, 2021 AT 9:30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CHSC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less