This case was last updated from Le Flore County Courts on 07/25/2022 at 15:34:48 (UTC).

IN RE: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR ANGEL ANN BANDERET AND JARRETT HAROLD BANDERERET

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 IN RE FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR ANGEL ANN BANDERET AND JARRETT HAROLD BANDERERET was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Le Flore County Courts, Le Flore County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is MCBEE, JENNIFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0019

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Le Flore, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

MCBEE, JENNIFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANDERET, ANGEL ANN

Defendant

BANDERERET, JARRETT HAROLD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SANDERS, DOUG JR.

Po Box 279

Poteau, OK 74953

BUCKLES, GARY R.

P.O. Box 771

Poteau, OK 74953

 

Court Documents

FILE AND ENTER PETITION

01/21/2022: FILE AND ENTER PETITION

FILE EX PARTE FOR DISCLOSURE OF CONFIDENTIAL SAFETY

01/28/2022: FILE EX PARTE FOR DISCLOSURE OF CONFIDENTIAL SAFETY

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

02/02/2022: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

FILE NOTICE OF DICLAIMER OF INTEREST OF DHS

02/07/2022: FILE NOTICE OF DICLAIMER OF INTEREST OF DHS

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2022
  • HearingEvent: TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE COURT MINUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE GAL REPORT (UNDER SEAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE COURT MINUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • HearingEvent: TEMPORARY ORDER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE COURT MINUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • HearingEvent: TEMPORARY ORDER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE COURT MINUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE NOTICE OF DICLAIMER OF INTEREST OF DHS

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANDERS, DOUG JR.