This case was last updated from Garfield County Courts on 02/08/2022 at 06:07:37 (UTC).

HENRY SCHEIN, INC., Plaintiff, v. ALACRITY HEALTHCARE, LLC DBA URGENT CARE, WOODWARD ADBA URGENT CARE OF GUYMON, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 HENRY SCHEIN, INC , Plaintiff filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALACRITY HEALTHCARE, LLC DBA URGENT CARE, WOODWARD ADBA URGENT CARE OF GUYMON, Defendant. This case was filed in Garfield County Courts, Garfield County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Seigars, Jason. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-467

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Garfield, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Seigars, Jason

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HENRY SCHEIN COMPANY

Defendant

ALACRITY HEALTHCARE, LLC DBA URGENT CARE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEHMAN, SCOTT F

Attorney at LATHAM, STALL, WAGNER, STEELE & LEHMAN, PC

1437 South Bouldersuite 820

Tulsa, OK 74119

 

Court Documents

PETITION

12/28/2020: PETITION

SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

12/28/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: ALACRITY HEALTHCARE 2/10/21

02/22/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: ALACRITY HEALTHCARE 2/10/21

NON RESPONSIVE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

04/05/2021: NON RESPONSIVE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL

04/05/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL

DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED

04/28/2021: DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING DEFAULT JUDGMENT

05/13/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING DEFAULT JUDGMENT

GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS (POST JUDGMENT)

05/17/2021: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS (POST JUDGMENT)

ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT BY NBC OKLAHOMA 89.42

06/09/2021: ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT BY NBC OKLAHOMA 89.42

GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS (POST JUDGMENT)

11/18/2021: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS (POST JUDGMENT)

GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED MAILED BY PLAIN OR ATTORNEY

11/18/2021: GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED MAILED BY PLAIN OR ATTORNEY

GARNISHEE'S ANSWER BY ALACRITY HEALTHCARE

12/16/2021: GARNISHEE'S ANSWER BY ALACRITY HEALTHCARE

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: NBC OKLAHOMA BY CERT MAIL 11-26-21

01/26/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: NBC OKLAHOMA BY CERT MAIL 11-26-21

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: NBC OKLAHOMA BY CERT MAIL 11-26-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ATG; Description: GARNISHEE'S ANSWER BY ALACRITY HEALTHCARE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2021-507017 ON 11/18/2021. PAYOR: LATHAM STEELE LEHMAN KEELE TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 76.64. LINE ITEMS: CS-2020-467: $33.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CS-2020-467: $0.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CS-2020-467: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CS-2020-467: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2020-467: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CS-2020-467: $0.98 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CS-2020-467: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2020-467: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: GSIMA; Description: GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED MAILED BY PLAIN OR ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN04; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCode: CCRMPF; Description: COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN05; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $5 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN155; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCode: SJFIS; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND - INTERPRETER AND TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN0155; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTION; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCode: CONTRACT; Description: BREACH OF AGREEMENT - CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: BREACH OF AGREEMENT - CONTRACT(CONTRACT); Filed By: HENRY SCHEIN COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less