This case was last updated from Grady County Courts on 05/08/2022 at 03:43:10 (UTC).

HEARTLAND LOANS V. CHRISTOPHER KELLOGG

Case Summary

On 06/22/2018 HEARTLAND LOANS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER KELLOGG. This case was filed in Grady County Courts, Grady County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is BRAUER, TIMOTHY A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0413

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Grady, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

BRAUER, TIMOTHY A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HEARTLAND LOANS

Defendant

KELLOGG, CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

RET AFFIDAVIT, SERVED CHRISTOPHER KELLOGG BY LEAVING

07/23/2018: RET AFFIDAVIT, SERVED CHRISTOPHER KELLOGG BY LEAVING

MOTION TO REQUIRE JUDGMENT DEBTOR TO ANSWER AS TO ASSETS

03/20/2019: MOTION TO REQUIRE JUDGMENT DEBTOR TO ANSWER AS TO ASSETS

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2019
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RET. HOA- NOT SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTION TO REQUIRE JUDGMENT DEBTOR TO ANSWER AS TO ASSETS; Amount: $ 33.00

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CONTINUING GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT; Amount: $ 63.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: $739.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEFAULT JUDGMENT, $621.10 + 58.00 CC + 60.00 PPS =

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COPY WITH WIFE 7-18-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RET AFFIDAVIT, SERVED CHRISTOPHER KELLOGG BY LEAVING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less