This case was last updated from Oklahoma County Courts on 02/23/2023 at 01:30:59 (UTC).

Gregory L Simon, Plaintiff, v. THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA, EX., REL.The Department Of Public Safety, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 Gregory L Simon, Plaintiff, filed an Other lawsuit against THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA, EX , REL The Department Of Public Safety, Defendant. This case was filed in Oklahoma County Courts, Oklahoma County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-159

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Oklahoma, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Simon, Gregory L

Defendant

The Department Of Public Safety

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Morton, Brian

600 West Sheridan Ave

Okc, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF PETITION AND ORDER OF HEARING TO DEPT OF PUBLIC SAFETY # 7018 1830 0000 7784 3669

01/22/2020: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF PETITION AND ORDER OF HEARING TO DEPT OF PUBLIC SAFETY # 7018 1830 0000 7784 3669

ORDER

01/21/2020: ORDER

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

02/07/2020: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

GREEN CARD FILED, CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEPT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, SIGNED BY MANDY HARJO 1-23-2020

01/28/2020: GREEN CARD FILED, CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEPT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, SIGNED BY MANDY HARJO 1-23-2020

APPEAL PETITION

01/21/2020: APPEAL PETITION

FINAL ORDER / JUDGE PIPES

07/16/2020: FINAL ORDER / JUDGE PIPES

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: FO; Description: FINAL ORDER / JUDGE PIPES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • HearingEvent: DPS HEARING; Party: The Department Of Public Safety; Docket: Chief Special Judge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE PIPES/ DPS HEARING/ STRICKEN BY AGREEMENT ORDER TO BE PRESENTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Docket: Chief Special Judge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE PIPES FOR COLLINS/ DPS/ CONT B/A TO 3-17-20 @ 1:30 PM BEFORE JUDGE PIPES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OG; Description: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: GC; Description: GREEN CARD FILED, CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEPT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, SIGNED BY MANDY HARJO 1-23-2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CM; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF PETITION AND ORDER OF HEARING TO DEPT OF PUBLIC SAFETY # 7018 1830 0000 7784 3669

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2020-4750025 ON 01/21/2020. PAYOR: HUNSUCKER LEGAL GROUP PC TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 174.14. LINE ITEMS: CV-2020-159: $95.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CV-2020-159: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. CV-2020-159: $1.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CV-2020-159: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CV-2020-159: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CV-2020-159: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. CV-2020-159: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CV-2020-159: $2.48 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CV-2020-159: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CV-2020-159: $10.00 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. CV-2020-159: $10.00 ON AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY. CV-2020-159: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE STALLINGS, SUSAN TO THIS CASE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 85.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: APPLDL; Description: APPLICATION RE: REVOCATION OF DRIVERS LICENSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL MISC. INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: APPLICATION RE: REVOCATION OF DRIVERS LICENSE(APPLDL); Filed By: Simon, Gregory L; Disposed: Pending.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less