This case was last updated from Murray County Courts on 05/13/2022 at 05:00:51 (UTC).

GREG AYRES V. DILLON LOGISTICS INC.

Case Summary

On 07/24/2018 GREG AYRES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DILLON LOGISTICS INC. This case was filed in Murray County Courts, Murray County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is COPPEDGE, WALLACE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0136

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Murray, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

COPPEDGE, WALLACE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AYRES, GREG

Defendant

DILLON LOGISTICS INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT (COPIES MAILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • HearingEvent: SC SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT (RETURNED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: TALMAGE C & C BACKHOE SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUBPOENA (ISSUED) BACK TO PHIL HURST SERVING: MITCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SERVING: LISA COCHRAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUBPOENA (ISSUED) AS FOLLOWS: BACK TO PHIL HURST; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTFIED MAIL RETURN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFIED MAIL #9171082133393826051817

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MAIL FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER AFFIDAVIT & ORDER RECOVERY OF $ / REPLEV; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less