This case was last updated from Adair County Courts on 09/03/2021 at 10:11:55 (UTC).

GREEN COMPANIES DEVELOPMENT GROUP INC., Plaintiff, v. LESLIE BENNETT, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 GREEN COMPANIES DEVELOPMENT GROUP INC , Plaintiff filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LESLIE BENNETT, Defendant. This case was filed in Adair County Courts, Adair County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Huggins, Gary. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-350

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Adair, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Huggins, Gary

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREEN COMPANIES DEVELOPMENT GROUP INC.

Defendant

BENNETT, LESLIE

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT

12/28/2020: AFFIDAVIT

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: <.leslie bennett="">

12/31/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: <.leslie bennett="">

COURT MINUTE ORDER

01/05/2021: COURT MINUTE ORDER

MINUTE ORDER (CASE CONTINUED TO 3/2/21)

02/02/2021: MINUTE ORDER (CASE CONTINUED TO 3/2/21)

MINUTE ORDER

02/02/2021: MINUTE ORDER

COURT MINUTE ORDER EVICTION GRANTED FOR 4/1/21

03/02/2021: COURT MINUTE ORDER EVICTION GRANTED FOR 4/1/21

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Party: GREEN COMPANIES DEVELOPMENT GROUP INC.; Docket: Gary Huggins

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: JUDGEMENT ENTERED; Judge; Party Details; Defendant: BENNETT, LESLIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: JUDGEMENT ENTERED; Judge; Party Details; Plaintiff: GREEN COMPANIES DEVELOPMENT GROUP INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: COURT MINUTE ORDER EVICTION GRANTED FOR 4/1/21; Party: GREEN COMPANIES DEVELOPMENT GROUP INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Party: GREEN COMPANIES DEVELOPMENT GROUP INC.; Docket: Gary Huggins

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: MINUTE ORDER; Party: BENNETT, LESLIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: MINUTE ORDER (CASE CONTINUED TO 3/2/21); Party: GREEN COMPANIES DEVELOPMENT GROUP INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Party: GREEN COMPANIES DEVELOPMENT GROUP INC.; Docket: Gary Huggins

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: COURT MINUTE ORDER; Party: BENNETT, LESLIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: <.leslie bennett="">

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2020-133094 ON 12/28/2020. PAYOR: GREEN COMPANIES DEVELOPMENT GROUP INC. TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 108.00. LINE ITEMS: SC-2020-350: $45.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. SC-2020-350: $50.00 ON AC08 SHERIFF FEES. SC-2020-350: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. SC-2020-350: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE HUGGINS, GARY TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCode: AC08; Description: SHERIFF'S FEES CIVIL AND CRIMINAL; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFDC1; Description: AFFIDAVIT; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCode: SCINDEBT1; Description: INDEBTEDNESS less than $5000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: FORCIBLE ENTRY & DETAINER less than $5000.00.(SCFED1); Filed By: GREEN COMPANIES DEVELOPMENT GROUP INC.

    Read MoreRead Less