This case was last updated from Beckham County Courts on 07/17/2021 at 18:23:14 (UTC).

GREAT PLAINS REG. MED. CENTER V. TYLER SCOTT BELL

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 GREAT PLAINS REG MED CENTER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TYLER SCOTT BELL. This case was filed in Beckham County Courts, Beckham County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is ROPER, HONORABLE MICHELLE K.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0338

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Beckham, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

ROPER, HONORABLE MICHELLE K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREAT PLAINS REG. MED. CENTER

Defendant

BELL, TYLER SCOTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

FISHER, MR. TIMOTHY A.

Attorney at FISHER & FISHER

8177 S. Harvard #333

Tulsa, OK 74137

 

Court Documents

ALIAS AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER ISSUED

12/07/2018: ALIAS AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2019
  • HearingEvent: ROPER-SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketDescription: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketDescription: PARTIES APPEAR. AGREED ORDER GRANTED. MKR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketDescription: COURT ORDER MINUTE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketDescription: ALIAS AFFIDAVIT AND SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • HearingEvent: ROPER-SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ALIAS AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • HearingEvent: ROPER-SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketDescription: NO SERVICE. (MKR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketDescription: COURT ORDER MINUTE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketDescription: ALIAS AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • HearingEvent: ROPER-SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketDescription: NO SERVICE. (MKR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketDescription: COURT ORDER MINUTE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketDescription: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketDescription: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER ISSUED; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less