This case was last updated from Garvin County Courts on 06/05/2022 at 03:46:26 (UTC).

GORDON WHITE LUMBER CO V. DONALD FEARING

Case Summary

On 07/25/2018 GORDON WHITE LUMBER CO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DONALD FEARING. This case was filed in Garvin County Courts, Garvin County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is KENDALL, STEVEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0185

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Garvin, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

KENDALL, STEVEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GORDON WHITE LUMBER CO

Defendant

FEARING, DONALD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATEMENT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATEMENT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DONALD FEARING- NOT FOUND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER TO APPEAR& ANSWER AS TO ASSETS ETC RET'D-

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: TO GET SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER TO APPEAR & ANSWER AS TO ASSETS ETC ISS'D- (PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SMALL CLAIMS JUDG- JUDG FOR PLTF FOR $1,015.11 + COSTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 7/28/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORIGINAL AFFID/ORDER RET'D- SERVED DONALD FEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 1.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED; Amount: $ -1.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT & ORDER ISSUED (BY PPS); Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less