This case was last updated from Adair County Courts on 07/17/2021 at 18:22:57 (UTC).

GLORENA SUE RUSSELL, Plaintiff, v. WAITIE THIRSTY, Defendant, and KASSANDRA DAWN SAWNEY, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 GLORENA SUE RUSSELL, Plaintiff filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WAITIE THIRSTY, Defendant, and KASSANDRA DAWN SAWNEY, Defendant. This case was filed in Adair County Courts, Adair County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Huggins, Gary. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-371

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Adair, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Huggins, Gary

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RUSSELL, GLORENA SUE

Defendants

SAWNEY, KASSANDRA DAWN

THIRSTY, WAITIE

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT

08/23/2018: AFFIDAVIT

ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURN SERVICE KASSANDRA SAWNEY SERVED 8-25-2018 WATIE THIRSTY SERVED 8-25-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE ATTACHED

08/27/2018: ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURN SERVICE KASSANDRA SAWNEY SERVED 8-25-2018 WATIE THIRSTY SERVED 8-25-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE ATTACHED

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

09/04/2018: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

AMENDED JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

10/02/2018: AMENDED JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2018
  • HearingEvent: REVIEW; Party: RUSSELL,GLORENASUE; Docket: Gary Huggins

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AM; Description: AMENDED JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT; Party: RUSSELL, GLORENA SUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: JUDGEMENT ENTERED; Judge; Party Details; Defendant: SAWNEY, KASSANDRA DAWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: JUDGEMENT ENTERED; Judge; Party Details; Defendant: THIRSTY, WAITIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: JEJ; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT; Party: RUSSELL, GLORENA SUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURN SERVICE KASSANDRA SAWNEY SERVED 8-25-2018 WATIE THIRSTY SERVED 8-25-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE ATTACHED; Party: SAWNEY, KASSANDRA DAWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2018-115130 ON 08/23/2018. PAYOR: RUSSELL/GLORENA TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 108.00. LINE ITEMS: SC-2018-371: $43.88 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. SC-2018-371: $48.75 ON AC08 SHERIFF FEES. SC-2018-371: $2.70 ON AC09 CARD ALLOCATIONS. SC-2018-371: $5.85 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. SC-2018-371: $6.82 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: ADJUSTING ENTRY: MONIES DUE TO THE FOLLOWING AGENCIES REDUCED BY THE FOLLOWING AMOUNTS:SC-2018-371: AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY -$0.18SC-2018-371: AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL -$0.15SC-2018-371: AC08 SHERIFF FEES -$1.25SC-2018-371: AC01 CLERK FEES -$1.12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketCode: ADJUST; Description: ADJUSTING ENTRY: MONIES DUE TO AC09-CARD ALLOCATION; Amount: $ 2.70

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE HUGGINS, GARY TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketCode: AC08; Description: SHERIFF'S FEES CIVIL AND CRIMINAL; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFDC1; Description: AFFIDAVIT; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketCode: SCFED1; Description: FORCIBLE ENTRY & DETAINER less than $5000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: FORCIBLE ENTRY & DETAINER less than $5000.00.(SCFED1); Filed By: RUSSELL, GLORENA SUE

    Read MoreRead Less