This case was last updated from Bryan County Courts on 03/20/2022 at 10:41:23 (UTC).

GARY CLARK V. BOBBY LEE THOMAS

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 GARY CLARK filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BOBBY LEE THOMAS. This case was filed in Bryan County Courts, Bryan County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0075

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Bryan, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLARK, GARY

Defendant

THOMAS, BOBBY LEE

 

Court Documents

FILE AFFIDAVIT & ISSUE ORDER

02/24/2021: FILE AFFIDAVIT & ISSUE ORDER

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO BOBBY THOMAS ON 2-28-21 BY

03/01/2021: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO BOBBY THOMAS ON 2-28-21 BY

CM: PLF APPRS IN PERSON

03/19/2021: CM: PLF APPRS IN PERSON

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • HearingEvent: HRG ON SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AT THE STATUTORY RATE. MRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FORCIBLE ENTRY, COURT COSTS, SERVICE COSTS AND INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JUDGMENT FOR PLF AS FOLLOWS: $3400 DUE W/I 90 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: WITNESSES SWORN AND TESTIMONY TAKEN. COURT ORDERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEF APPEARS. NO DISAGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM: PLF APPRS IN PERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • HearingEvent: HRG ON SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 9:00AM. AR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM: PLF APPEARS. DEF APPEARS. CASE CONT'D 3-19-21 @

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LEAVING A COPY WITH AMBER THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: WFILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO BOBBY THOMAS ON 2-28-21 BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OF THE CARES ACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE VERIFICATION OF COMPLIANCE WITH SECTION 4042

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT & ISSUE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DOCKET FEE; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less