This case was last updated from Pushmataha County Courts on 07/15/2022 at 11:22:21 (UTC).

Gardenwalk Clayton v. Haynes, Sarah

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 Gardenwalk Clayton filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Haynes, Sarah. This case was filed in Pushmataha County Courts, Pushmataha County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Wallace, Jana Kay. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****21-4

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Pushmataha, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Wallace, Jana Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gardenwalk Clayton

Defendant

Haynes, Sarah

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Foutch, Jessica

Po Box 890

Hugo, OK 74743

 

Court Documents

SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING.

01/19/2021: SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING.

RETURN UNSERVED TO SARAH HAYNES

02/03/2021: RETURN UNSERVED TO SARAH HAYNES

RETURN OF SERVICE- NOT SERVED. VACANT

02/23/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE- NOT SERVED. VACANT

ALIAS AFFIDAVIT AND SUMMONS

03/25/2021: ALIAS AFFIDAVIT AND SUMMONS

GARDEN WALK PRESENT IN COURT. DEFENDANT WAS NOT SERVED. GARDEN WALK IS TO GET AN ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET FOR APRIL 29TH, 2021 @ 10:30 AM

03/25/2021: GARDEN WALK PRESENT IN COURT. DEFENDANT WAS NOT SERVED. GARDEN WALK IS TO GET AN ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET FOR APRIL 29TH, 2021 @ 10:30 AM

RETURN SERVED

04/21/2021: RETURN SERVED

ORDER

04/29/2021: ORDER

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

04/29/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

PLAIN CALLED THE COURTS ON 5-27-21, AND AGREED TO CONTINUE CASE TO JULY 29,2021 @ 10:30A.M.. PLAIN STATED THEY HAD RECEIVED A LETTER OF A PROMISE TO PAY. COURT ALSO CONTACTED THE DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY JESSICA FOUTCH. DEFENDANTS ATTROENY HAS AGREED TO

05/27/2021: PLAIN CALLED THE COURTS ON 5-27-21, AND AGREED TO CONTINUE CASE TO JULY 29,2021 @ 10:30A.M.. PLAIN STATED THEY HAD RECEIVED A LETTER OF A PROMISE TO PAY. COURT ALSO CONTACTED THE DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY JESSICA FOUTCH. DEFENDANTS ATTROENY HAS AGREED TO THE CONTINUANCE AS WELL.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCode: RETUC; Description: RETURN LETTER -UNCLAIMED TO GARDEN WALK- CLAYTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • HearingEvent: CLAIMS / HEARING; Party: Haynes,Sarah; Docket: Jana Kay Wallace

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED; Judge; Party Details; Defendant: Haynes, Sarah

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: CASE COMES ON TODAY. GARDENWALK FAILED TO APPEAR TODAY. MRS. FOUTCH PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT. CASE DISMISSED. GARDENWALK HAS RECIEVED MONEY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • HearingEvent: CLAIMS / HEARING; Party: Gardenwalk Clayton; Docket: Jana Kay Wallace

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: MRS. FOUTCH PRESENT IN COURT FOR THE DEF. GARDEN WALK FAILED TO APPEAR. CASE IS CONTINUED TO OCT 28,2021 @ 10:30A.M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • HearingEvent: CLAIMS / HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JESSICA FOUTCH PRESENT FOR MRS. HAYNES. GARDEN WALK NOT PRESENT. CASE CONTINUED TO AUG. 26TH, 2021 @ 10:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • HearingEvent: CLAIMS / HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • HearingEvent: CLAIMS / HEARING; Party: Gardenwalk Clayton; Docket: Jana Kay Wallace

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RET; Description: RETURN UNSERVED TO SARAH HAYNES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2021-88173 ON 01/19/2021. PAYOR: TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 108.00. LINE ITEMS: SC-2021-4: $45.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. SC-2021-4: $50.00 ON AC08 SHERIFF FEES. SC-2021-4: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. SC-2021-4: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE WALLACE, JANA KAY TO THIS CASE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCode: SMIS; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED - SHERIFF; Amount: $ 50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCode: AFDC1; Description: AFFIDAVIT; Amount: $ 45.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCode: SCFED1; Description: FORCIBLE ENTRY & DETAINER less than $5000.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: FORCIBLE ENTRY & DETAINER less than $5000.00.(SCFED1); Filed By: Gardenwalk Clayton

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less