This case was last updated from Choctaw County Courts on 06/23/2022 at 02:45:50 (UTC).

FREEMAN RANCHES, LLC, V. D & R CONSTRUCTION & MATERIALS

Case Summary

On 11/08/2021 FREEMAN RANCHES, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against D R CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS. This case was filed in Choctaw County Courts, Choctaw County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is DEBERRY, MICHAEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0043

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Choctaw, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

DEBERRY, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FREEMAN RANCHES, LLC

Defendant

D & R CONSTRUCTION & MATERIALS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

O'HARA, PAT

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

P.O. Box 1387

Clinton, OK 73601

YOUNGBLOOD, DAVID

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

P.O. Box 540

Atoka, OK 74525

 

Court Documents

FILE AND ENTER PETITION

11/08/2021: FILE AND ENTER PETITION

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/08/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS

12/03/2021: BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS

ANSWER

12/06/2021: ANSWER

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: REQUEST TO DISMISS DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SPECIAL ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CHSC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'HARA, PAT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YOUNGBLOOD, DAVID