This case was last updated from Oklahoma County Courts on 07/28/2022 at 11:24:38 (UTC).

Freedom Mortgage Corporation, Plaintiff, v. Kim Loan Nguyen, SPOUSE OF Kim Loan Nguyen, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, State Of Oklahoma, EX REL, OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISSION Defendant.

Case Summary

On 03/08/2022 Freedom Mortgage Corporation, Plaintiff filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Kim Loan Nguyen, SPOUSE OF Kim Loan Nguyen, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, State Of Oklahoma, EX REL, OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISSION Defendant. This case was filed in Oklahoma County Courts, Oklahoma County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Stinson, Sheila. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1057

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Oklahoma, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Stinson, Sheila

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Freedom Mortgage Corporation

Defendants

Nguyen, Kim Loan

State Of Oklahoma

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JENKINS, Kim

Attorney at BAER & TIMBERLAKE PC

5901 N. Western, Suite 300

Oklahoma City, OK 73118

Pogue Jenkins, Kim

5901 N. Western, Suite 300

Oklahoma City, OK 73118

 

Court Documents

PETITION

03/08/2022: PETITION

DISCLAIMER OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA, EX REL. OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISSION

03/25/2022: DISCLAIMER OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA, EX REL. OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISSION

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: SPOUSE OF KIM LOAN NGUYEN (AKA VAN THIET TRAN) DIED BEFORE 8-21-21 3-18-22

04/06/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: SPOUSE OF KIM LOAN NGUYEN (AKA VAN THIET TRAN) DIED BEFORE 8-21-21 3-18-22

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: STATE OF OKLAHOMA EX REL., OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISSION TO JIALI GRELLNER AS AUTHORIZED 3-21-22

04/06/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: STATE OF OKLAHOMA EX REL., OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISSION TO JIALI GRELLNER AS AUTHORIZED 3-21-22

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: KIM LOAN NGUYEN DIED BEFORE 8-21-21

04/06/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: KIM LOAN NGUYEN DIED BEFORE 8-21-21

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: JOHN DOE 3-18-22 VACANT

04/06/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: JOHN DOE 3-18-22 VACANT

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: JANE DOE 3-18-22 VACANT

04/06/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: JANE DOE 3-18-22 VACANT

FIRST AMENDED PETITION

04/21/2022: FIRST AMENDED PETITION

NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

04/21/2022: NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

04/21/2022: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

05/02/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

PROOF OF PUBLICATION--JOURNAL RECORD--ORDER #12112081--PUBLISHER'S FEE $129.86--PAID DIRECT

05/09/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION--JOURNAL RECORD--ORDER #12112081--PUBLISHER'S FEE $129.86--PAID DIRECT

DISCLAIMER OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA, EX REL., OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISSION TO PLAIN 'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION

05/12/2022: DISCLAIMER OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA, EX REL., OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISSION TO PLAIN 'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION

PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

07/20/2022: PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

07/20/2022: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ANMS; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MODJ; Description: PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DISCL; Description: DISCLAIMER OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA, EX REL., OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISSION TO PLAIN 'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION--JOURNAL RECORD--ORDER #12112081--PUBLISHER'S FEE $129.86--PAID DIRECT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NO; Description: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NO; Description: NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AMP; Description: FIRST AMENDED PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMU; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: JANE DOE 3-18-22 VACANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMU; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: JOHN DOE 3-18-22 VACANT

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketCode: FORE; Description: FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: FORECLOSURE(FORE); Filed By: Freedom Mortgage Corporation; Disposed: Pending.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pogue Jenkins, Kim

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jenkins, Kim