This case was last updated from Le Flore County Courts on 01/19/2022 at 18:32:48 (UTC).

FORT SMITH HMA, LLC V. CARIL STARR

Case Summary

On 07/05/2018 FORT SMITH HMA, LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against CARIL STARR. This case was filed in Le Flore County Courts, Le Flore County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is SULLIVAN, JONATHAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0282

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Le Flore, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

SULLIVAN, JONATHAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORT SMITH HMA, LLC

Defendant

STARR, CARIL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GUBBINS, JASON P

Po Box 10110

Columbia, MO 65205

 

Court Documents

ISSUE GARNISHMENT SUMMONS (MAIL FEE)

06/12/2019: ISSUE GARNISHMENT SUMMONS (MAIL FEE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RELEASE OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE GARNISHMENT ANSWER/AFFIDAVIT/CALCULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE GARNISHMENT ANSWER/AFFIDAVIT/CALCULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RETURN GREEN CARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUBBINS, JASON P