This case was last updated from Pushmataha County Courts on 03/25/2022 at 19:38:17 (UTC).

Firstbank, Plaintiff, v. Taylor Mcgee, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 04/23/2021 Firstbank, Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Taylor Mcgee, Defendant. This case was filed in Pushmataha County Courts, Pushmataha County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Wallace, Jana Kay. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1-24

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pushmataha, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Wallace, Jana Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Firstbank

Defendant

Mcgee, Taylor

 

Court Documents

SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING.

04/23/2021: SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING.

RETURN OF UNSERVED TO TAYLOR MCGEE

04/23/2021: RETURN OF UNSERVED TO TAYLOR MCGEE

ALIAS AFFIDAVIT

05/27/2021: ALIAS AFFIDAVIT

FIRST BANK APPEARED TODAY. DEF HAS NOT BEEN SERVED. CASE CONTINUED TO JULY 29,2021 @ 10:30A.M.. FIRST BANK TO GET AN ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED.

05/27/2021: FIRST BANK APPEARED TODAY. DEF HAS NOT BEEN SERVED. CASE CONTINUED TO JULY 29,2021 @ 10:30A.M.. FIRST BANK TO GET AN ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED.

RETURN OF SERVICE- NOT SERVED

07/29/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE- NOT SERVED

FIRST BANK PRESENT IN COURT. TAYLOR MCGEE WAS NOT SERVED AT THIS TIME. FIRST BANK WISHES TO DISMISS THE CASE AT THIS TIME.

07/29/2021: FIRST BANK PRESENT IN COURT. TAYLOR MCGEE WAS NOT SERVED AT THIS TIME. FIRST BANK WISHES TO DISMISS THE CASE AT THIS TIME.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • HearingEvent: CLAIMS / HEARING; Party: Firstbank; Docket: Jana Kay Wallace

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED; Judge; Party Details; Defendant: Mcgee, Taylor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: FIRST BANK PRESENT IN COURT. TAYLOR MCGEE WAS NOT SERVED AT THIS TIME. FIRST BANK WISHES TO DISMISS THE CASE AT THIS TIME.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RET; Description: RETURN OF SERVICE- NOT SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • HearingEvent: CLAIMS / HEARING; Party: Firstbank; Docket: Jana Kay Wallace

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: FIRST BANK APPEARED TODAY. DEF HAS NOT BEEN SERVED. CASE CONTINUED TO JULY 29,2021 @ 10:30A.M.. FIRST BANK TO GET AN ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ALIAS AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2021-89460 ON 04/23/2021. PAYOR: FIRSTBANK TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 108.00. LINE ITEMS: SC-2021-24: $45.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. SC-2021-24: $50.00 ON AC08 SHERIFF FEES. SC-2021-24: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. SC-2021-24: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE WALLACE, JANA KAY TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RET; Description: RETURN OF UNSERVED TO TAYLOR MCGEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCode: SMIS; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED - SHERIFF; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCode: AFDC1; Description: AFFIDAVIT; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCode: SCINDEBT1; Description: INDEBTEDNESS less than $5000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS less than $5000.00.(SCINDEBT1); Filed By: Firstbank

    Read MoreRead Less