This case was last updated from Muskogee County Courts on 04/12/2022 at 18:46:18 (UTC).

FIRSTAR BANK V. BAILEE PAGE

Case Summary

On 08/19/2021 FIRSTAR BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BAILEE PAGE. This case was filed in Muskogee County Courts, Muskogee County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is STOUT, WELDON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0668

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Muskogee, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

STOUT, WELDON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRSTAR BANK

Defendant

PAGE, BAILEE

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE

09/15/2021: PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF CASE SETTING

09/23/2021: NOTICE OF CASE SETTING

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE OF CASE SETTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CASE RESET TO 10-8-2021 @ 9AM R.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM/PLAIN APPEARS PRO SE; DEFENDANT DID NOT APPEAR;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF NON-SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT & ORDER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less