This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 01/16/2023 at 09:12:03 (UTC).

FIRST UNITED BANK & TRUST CO. V. JANE DOE, AS OCCUPANT OF THE, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 FIRST UNITED BANK TRUST CO filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JANE DOE, AS OCCUPANT OF THE,. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0029

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST UNITED BANK & TRUST CO.

Defendants

STATE OF OKLAHOMA EX REL

JOHN DOE

JANE DOE, AS OCCUPANT OF THE

HAUGHN, MISTY

HAUGHN, ROBERT

 

Court Documents

FILE PETITION (OVER $10,000.)

01/22/2020: FILE PETITION (OVER $10,000.)

FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE- MORGAN LANKFORD

02/27/2020: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE- MORGAN LANKFORD

FILE ANSWER OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA, EX REL. OKLAHOMA

02/27/2020: FILE ANSWER OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA, EX REL. OKLAHOMA

FILE SUMMONS & RETURN- JANE DOE, NOT FOUND

02/28/2020: FILE SUMMONS & RETURN- JANE DOE, NOT FOUND

FILE SUMMONS & RETURN- JOHN DOE, NOT FOUND

02/28/2020: FILE SUMMONS & RETURN- JOHN DOE, NOT FOUND

FILE SUMMONS & RETURN- STATE OF OK, SERVED 2-6-2020

02/28/2020: FILE SUMMONS & RETURN- STATE OF OK, SERVED 2-6-2020

FILE SUMMONS & RETURN- MISTY HAUGHN, SERVED BY LEAVING

02/28/2020: FILE SUMMONS & RETURN- MISTY HAUGHN, SERVED BY LEAVING

FILE SUMMONS & RETURN- ROBERT, SERVED 2-7-2020

02/28/2020: FILE SUMMONS & RETURN- ROBERT, SERVED 2-7-2020

FILE DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUICE

03/29/2021: FILE DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSED/SETTLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE SUMMONS & RETURN- ROBERT, SERVED 2-7-2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: A COPY WITH ROBERT 2-7-2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE SUMMONS & RETURN- MISTY HAUGHN, SERVED BY LEAVING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE SUMMONS & RETURN- STATE OF OK, SERVED 2-6-2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE SUMMONS & RETURN- JOHN DOE, NOT FOUND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE SUMMONS & RETURN- JANE DOE, NOT FOUND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION (OVER $10,000.); Amount: $ 163.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less