This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/22/2022 at 16:51:35 (UTC).

FIRST UNITED BANK AND TRUST CO V. TEATHER PEOPLES

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 FIRST UNITED BANK AND TRUST CO filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against TEATHER PEOPLES. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Seminole County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is OLSEN, HONORABLE TIMOTHY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0028

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

OLSEN, HONORABLE TIMOTHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST UNITED BANK AND TRUST CO

Defendant

PEOPLES, TEATHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BURRAGE, HEATHER

Po Box 1727

Durant, OK 74702

 

Court Documents

PETITION

04/01/2021: PETITION

ISSUED SUMMONS FOR TEATHER N. PEOPLES

04/01/2021: ISSUED SUMMONS FOR TEATHER N. PEOPLES

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

08/10/2021: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • HearingEvent: MOTION DOCKET-OLSEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER AND NOTICE FOR HEARING MOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUED SUMMONS FOR TEATHER N. PEOPLES; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BURRAGE, HEATHER