This case was last updated from Haskell County Courts on 05/19/2022 at 10:15:06 (UTC).

FIRST UNITED BANK AND TRUST CO V. OCCUPANTS OF THE PREMISES, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 05/17/2018 FIRST UNITED BANK AND TRUST CO filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against OCCUPANTS OF THE PREMISES. This case was filed in Haskell County Courts, Haskell County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is HENDERSON, BRIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0031

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Haskell, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

HENDERSON, BRIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST UNITED BANK AND TRUST CO

Defendants

ROSS, FRED L.

ROSS, JANET R.

DOE, JOHN

DOE, JANE

OCCUPANTS OF THE PREMISES

LAWSON BAIL BONDS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PUBLICATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER CONFIRMING SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF OF MAILING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SET FOR 01/15/20, AT 10 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING MOTION TO CONFIRM SALE FILED CASE IS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF SALE (WITH APPRAISEMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTION TO CONFIRM SALE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CHSC FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PDLTF; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER PETITION FOR CIVIL 10,000 OR MORE; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less