This case was last updated from Cleveland County Courts on 12/20/2021 at 05:04:11 (UTC).

FIRST STATE BANK, NOBLE, OKLAHOMA, Plaintiff, v. JUSTIN HECK, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 05/18/2018 FIRST STATE BANK, NOBLE, OKLAHOMA, Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against JUSTIN HECK, Defendant. This case was filed in Cleveland County Courts, Cleveland County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Stice, Steve. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2494

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Cleveland, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Stice, Steve

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST STATE BANK, NOBLE, OKLAHOMA

Defendant

HECK, JUSTIN

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT

05/18/2018: AFFIDAVIT

PARTY HAS NOT BEEN SUCCESSFULLY SERVED./ PPS/ JUSTIN HECK / 5-24-18

06/04/2018: PARTY HAS NOT BEEN SUCCESSFULLY SERVED./ PPS/ JUSTIN HECK / 5-24-18

CO: NO SERVICE, ALIAS MAY ISSUE. (JHN)

06/06/2018: CO: NO SERVICE, ALIAS MAY ISSUE. (JHN)

ALIAS ORDER ISSUED BY PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER / 12-4-18 1:30PM BEFORE JUDGE NAPOLI

10/04/2018: ALIAS ORDER ISSUED BY PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER / 12-4-18 1:30PM BEFORE JUDGE NAPOLI

APPLICATION FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

10/23/2018: APPLICATION FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

10/23/2018: ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

10/23/2018: NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

PARTY HAS BEEN SUCCESSFULLY SERVED./ ALIAS / PPS / JUSTIN HECK / SERVED BY SERVING HIS WIFE / WIFE REFUSED TO GIVE NAME OR ACCEPT PAPERS/ LEFT ON THE PORCH / 10-17-18

10/29/2018: PARTY HAS BEEN SUCCESSFULLY SERVED./ ALIAS / PPS / JUSTIN HECK / SERVED BY SERVING HIS WIFE / WIFE REFUSED TO GIVE NAME OR ACCEPT PAPERS/ LEFT ON THE PORCH / 10-17-18

CO: DEFAULT JUDGMENT RENDERED FOR PLAIN . $651.50, +CC. (JHN)

12/05/2018: CO: DEFAULT JUDGMENT RENDERED FOR PLAIN . $651.50, +CC. (JHN)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2018
  • HearingEvent: *ALIAS* CLAIMS / HEARING; Docket: Jequita H. Napoli

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DEFAULT JUDGEMENT; Default Judgment; Party Details; Defendant: HECK, JUSTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DISPCVDJ; Description: CO: DEFAULT JUDGMENT RENDERED FOR PLAIN . $651.50, +CC. (JHN); Count: 1; Party: HECK, JUSTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: S; Description: PARTY HAS BEEN SUCCESSFULLY SERVED./ ALIAS / PPS / JUSTIN HECK / SERVED BY SERVING HIS WIFE / WIFE REFUSED TO GIVE NAME OR ACCEPT PAPERS/ LEFT ON THE PORCH / 10-17-18; Party: HECK, JUSTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOPUB; Description: NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: APLI; Description: APPLICATION FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AOIP; Description: ALIAS ORDER ISSUED BY PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER / 12-4-18 1:30PM BEFORE JUDGE NAPOLI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • HearingEvent: CLAIMS / HEARING; Docket: Jequita H. Napoli

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: CO: NO SERVICE, ALIAS MAY ISSUE. (JHN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: U; Description: PARTY HAS NOT BEEN SUCCESSFULLY SERVED./ PPS/ JUSTIN HECK / 5-24-18; Party: HECK, JUSTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2018-1017068 ON 05/18/2018. PAYOR: FIRST STATE BANK TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 58.00. LINE ITEMS: SC-2018-2494: $45.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. SC-2018-2494: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. SC-2018-2494: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE STICE, STEVE TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketCode: SMIP; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFDC1; Description: AFFIDAVIT; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketCode: SCINDEBT1; Description: INDEBTEDNESS less than $5000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS less than $5000.00.(SCINDEBT1)

    Read MoreRead Less