This case was last updated from Washington County Courts on 05/20/2022 at 18:55:51 (UTC).

FIRST CAPITAL FINANCE V. SHELBY BAUMAN

Case Summary

On 06/08/2018 FIRST CAPITAL FINANCE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SHELBY BAUMAN. This case was filed in Washington County Courts, Washington County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is FRANKS, KYRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0393

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Washington, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

FRANKS, KYRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST CAPITAL FINANCE

Defendant

BAUMAN, SHELBY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2019
  • HearingEvent: RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT (SM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • HearingEvent: STATEMENT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATEMENT OF JUDGMENT (SM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • HearingEvent: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FOLLOWED BY $98.56/MONTH BEGINING 10-30-18. (CDR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COSTS OF $93.00. DEFT AGREES TO PAY $50.00 ON 10-19-18,

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 9-4-18 (SM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ALIAS AFFIDAVIT & ORDER RET'D SERVED;SHELLY BAUMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SVC)(SM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ALIAS AFFIDAVIT & ORDER, ISSUED (RETD TO PLTF FOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NO SERVICE. ALIAS TO BE ISSUED. (CDR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM:FRANKS- PLTF W/OUT ATTY- DEFT DOES NOT APPEAR DUE TO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER, ISSUED (RETD TO PLTF FOR SVC) (GP); Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less