This case was last updated from Stephens County Courts on 02/23/2022 at 06:17:19 (UTC).

FIRST BANK & TRUST CO V. SHANA BRANUM

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 FIRST BANK TRUST CO filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against SHANA BRANUM. This case was filed in Stephens County Courts, Stephens County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0065

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Stephens, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST BANK & TRUST CO

Defendant

BRANUM, SHANA

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT: DEFAULT JWH/LG

02/04/2021: JUDGMENT: DEFAULT JWH/LG

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING LG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • HearingEvent: ST:DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JUDGMENT: DEFAULT JWH/LG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM RET SERVED S.BRANUM 1/27/21 SP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% CASA, COJC, CHS TO DISTRICT COURT REV FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% CASA, COJC, CHS TO REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.66

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DK; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER - OVER $5000 W/CS PSR; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less