This case was last updated from Oklahoma County Courts on 04/18/2022 at 14:55:30 (UTC).

Kevin Ferrell, Plaintiff, v. The State Of Oklahoma, EX REL., THE DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY Defendant.

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Kevin Ferrell, Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against The State Of Oklahoma, EX REL , THE DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY Defendant. This case was filed in Oklahoma County Courts, Oklahoma County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Bonner, Anthony L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-120

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Oklahoma, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Bonner, Anthony L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ferrell, Kevin

Defendant

The State Of Oklahoma

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Morton, Brian

600 West Sheridan Ave

Okc, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

PETITION

01/21/2022: PETITION

ORDER

01/21/2022: ORDER

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF PETITION AND ORDER OF HEARING TO DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY #7021 0350 0000 2087 9000

01/24/2022: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF PETITION AND ORDER OF HEARING TO DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY #7021 0350 0000 2087 9000

GREEN CARD FILED---DEPT OF PUBLIC SAFETY---,MANDY HARJO 1/26/22

01/28/2022: GREEN CARD FILED---DEPT OF PUBLIC SAFETY---,MANDY HARJO 1/26/22

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

02/28/2022: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2022
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Party: The State OfOklahoma; Docket: Chief Special Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OG; Description: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Docket: Chief Special Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE PIPES/ DPS/ CONT TO 4/18/2022 @ 1:30 PM BEFORE JUDGE BURTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: GC; Description: GREEN CARD FILED---DEPT OF PUBLIC SAFETY---,MANDY HARJO 1/26/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CM; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF PETITION AND ORDER OF HEARING TO DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY #7021 0350 0000 2087 9000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2022-5130626 ON 01/21/2022. PAYOR: HUNSUCKER LEGAL GROUP PC TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 174.14. LINE ITEMS: CV-2022-120: $95.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CV-2022-120: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. CV-2022-120: $1.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CV-2022-120: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CV-2022-120: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CV-2022-120: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. CV-2022-120: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CV-2022-120: $2.48 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CV-2022-120: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CV-2022-120: $10.00 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. CV-2022-120: $10.00 ON AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY. CV-2022-120: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE BONNER, ANTHONY L. TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: P; Description: PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: APPLDL; Description: APPLICATION RE: REVOCATION OF DRIVERS LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL MISC. INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: APPLICATION RE: REVOCATION OF DRIVERS LICENSE(APPLDL); Filed By: Ferrell, Kevin; Disposed: Pending.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Morton, Brian