This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 05/19/2022 at 02:08:47 (UTC).

EXPRESS LOAN, INC. V. ERIKA L RICE

Case Summary

On 08/11/2021 EXPRESS LOAN, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ERIKA L RICE. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CAWTHON, J. DAVID. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0465

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CAWTHON, J. DAVID

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EXPRESS LOAN, INC.

Defendant

RICE, ERIKA L

 

Court Documents

FILE APPLICATION TO APPEAR FOR HEARING ON ASSETS

11/17/2021: FILE APPLICATION TO APPEAR FOR HEARING ON ASSETS

FILE ORDER TO APPEAR FOR HEARING ON ASSETS - HEARING

11/18/2021: FILE ORDER TO APPEAR FOR HEARING ON ASSETS - HEARING

FILE ALIAS APPLICATION TO APPEAR FOR HEARING ON ASSETS

01/11/2022: FILE ALIAS APPLICATION TO APPEAR FOR HEARING ON ASSETS

FILE PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ERIKA L RICE LEFT WITH

05/02/2022: FILE PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ERIKA L RICE LEFT WITH

FILE COURT MINUTE: PLAIN APPEARS, DEFENDANT FAILED

05/06/2022: FILE COURT MINUTE: PLAIN APPEARS, DEFENDANT FAILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2022
  • HearingEvent: HEARING ON ASSETS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CONTEMPT CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: TO APPEAR FOR HEARING ON ASSETS; PLAIN TO SEEK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE COURT MINUTE: PLAIN APPEARS, DEFENDANT FAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ROOMMATE- WHITE FEMALE ON 1-22-22 $45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ERIKA L RICE LEFT WITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2022
  • HearingEvent: DEFENDANT SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: HEARING SET FOR 5-6-22 AT 8:30 AM SPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ALIAS ORDER TO APPEAR FOR HEARING ON ASSETS -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: - HEARING SET FOR 5-6-22 AT 8:30 AM SPS

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE JOURNAL ENTRY:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FEMALE *ROOMMATE ON 8-19-21 $45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PROOF OF SERVICE TO ERIKA L RICE LEFT WITH WHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • HearingEvent: DEFENDANT SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • HearingEvent: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: HEARING SET FOR 9-8-21 AT 9:00 AM SPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM & ISSUE ORDER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less