This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 09/04/2022 at 11:29:21 (UTC).

EXPRESS LOAN, INC. V. ELIZABETH L LENA

Case Summary

On 08/11/2021 EXPRESS LOAN, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ELIZABETH L LENA. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Seminole, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CAWTHON, J. DAVID. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0469

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CAWTHON, J. DAVID

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EXPRESS LOAN, INC.

Defendant

LENA, ELIZABETH L

 

Court Documents

FILE ORDER TO APPEAR FOR CONTEMPT CITATION-HEARING SET

06/03/2022: FILE ORDER TO APPEAR FOR CONTEMPT CITATION-HEARING SET

FILE COURT MINUTE: PLAIN APPEARED, DEF NOT FOUND

01/07/2022: FILE COURT MINUTE: PLAIN APPEARED, DEF NOT FOUND

FILE PROOF OF SERVICE TO ELIZABETH L LENA ON 8-19-21

09/02/2021: FILE PROOF OF SERVICE TO ELIZABETH L LENA ON 8-19-21

FILE AFFIAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

08/11/2021: FILE AFFIAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM & ISSUE ORDER

08/11/2021: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM & ISSUE ORDER

FILE APPLICATION TO APPEAR FOR CONTEMPT CITATION

06/03/2022: FILE APPLICATION TO APPEAR FOR CONTEMPT CITATION

FILE COURT MINUTE: PLAIN APPEARS, DEFENDANT FAILED

05/06/2022: FILE COURT MINUTE: PLAIN APPEARS, DEFENDANT FAILED

FILE PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ELIZABETH L LENA LEFT WITH

05/02/2022: FILE PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ELIZABETH L LENA LEFT WITH

FILE ALIAS ORDER TO APPEAR FOR HEARING ON ASSETS -

01/11/2022: FILE ALIAS ORDER TO APPEAR FOR HEARING ON ASSETS -

FILE ALIAS APPLICATION TO APPEAR FOR HEARING ON ASSETS

01/11/2022: FILE ALIAS APPLICATION TO APPEAR FOR HEARING ON ASSETS

FILE ORDER TO APPEAR FOR HEARING ON ASSETS - HEARING

11/18/2021: FILE ORDER TO APPEAR FOR HEARING ON ASSETS - HEARING

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2022
  • HearingEvent: CONTEMPT CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FOR 11/04/22 AT 8:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER TO APPEAR FOR CONTEMPT CITATION-HEARING SET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE JOURNAL ENTRY:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: $45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PROOF OF SERVICE TO ELIZABETH L LENA ON 8-19-21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • HearingEvent: DEFENDANT SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • HearingEvent: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: HEARING SET FOR 9-8-21 AT 9:00 AM SPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM & ISSUE ORDER; Amount: $ 45.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less