This case was last updated from Garfield County Courts on 03/28/2022 at 12:57:54 (UTC).

ESTATE OF LINDA KAY OGLETREE DECEASED

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 ESTATE OF LINDA KAY OGLETREE DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Garfield County Courts, Garfield County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Newby, Tom. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1-73

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Garfield, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Newby, Tom

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BOBBIT, MICHELLE

Decedent

OGLETREE, LINDA KAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MCKEEVER, CLARK GARY

Po Box 1026

Enid, OK 73702

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND WAIVER OF GENERAL INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT AND ANNUAL AND FINAL ACCOUNTING

05/13/2021: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND WAIVER OF GENERAL INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT AND ANNUAL AND FINAL ACCOUNTING

NOTICE IF HEARING PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND WAIVER OF GENERAL INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT AND ANNUAL AND FINAL ACCOUNTING

05/14/2021: NOTICE IF HEARING PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND WAIVER OF GENERAL INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT AND ANNUAL AND FINAL ACCOUNTING

ORDER PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND WAIVER OF GENERAL INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT AND ANNUAL AND FINAL ACCOUNTING

05/14/2021: ORDER PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND WAIVER OF GENERAL INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT AND ANNUAL AND FINAL ACCOUNTING

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

05/14/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

ORDER FOR HEARING ON PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONA LREPRESENTATIVE, DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, AND ORDER WAIVING INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

05/14/2021: ORDER FOR HEARING ON PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONA LREPRESENTATIVE, DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, AND ORDER WAIVING INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONA REPRESENTATIVE, DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, AND ORDER WAIVING INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

05/14/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONA REPRESENTATIVE, DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, AND ORDER WAIVING INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION #24994 (LEGAL NEWS)

05/19/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION #24994 (LEGAL NEWS)

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND WAIVER OF INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT AND FINAL ACCOUNTING

06/02/2021: ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND WAIVER OF INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT AND FINAL ACCOUNTING

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

06/02/2021: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

PPLICATION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE TO SELL OR LEASE REAL PROPERTY WITHOUT RETURN OF SLAE UNDER POWER OFSALE

06/02/2021: PPLICATION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE TO SELL OR LEASE REAL PROPERTY WITHOUT RETURN OF SLAE UNDER POWER OFSALE

ORDER AUTHORIZING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE TO SELL REAL PROPERTY WITHOUT RETURN OF SALE

06/02/2021: ORDER AUTHORIZING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE TO SELL REAL PROPERTY WITHOUT RETURN OF SALE

CONSENT AND WAIVER - MICHELLE BOBBITT REPRESENTATIVE

06/02/2021: CONSENT AND WAIVER - MICHELLE BOBBITT REPRESENTATIVE

CONSENT AND WAIVER - MICHELLE BOBBITT

06/02/2021: CONSENT AND WAIVER - MICHELLE BOBBITT

NOTICE TO CREDITORS

06/02/2021: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING NOTICE TO CREDITORS

06/02/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING NOTICE TO CREDITORS

AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE TO CREDITORS #25057 (LEGAL NEWS)

06/16/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE TO CREDITORS #25057 (LEGAL NEWS)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE TO CREDITORS #25057 (LEGAL NEWS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2021-496080 ON 06/03/2021. PAYOR: CLARK MCKEEVER TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 86.64. LINE ITEMS: PB-2021-73: $43.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. PB-2021-73: $0.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. PB-2021-73: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. PB-2021-73: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. PB-2021-73: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. PB-2021-73: $0.98 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. PB-2021-73: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. PB-2021-73: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Docket: Tom Newby

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ANM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOTC; Description: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CONS; Description: CONSENT AND WAIVER - MICHELLE BOBBITT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CONS; Description: CONSENT AND WAIVER - MICHELLE BOBBITT REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER AUTHORIZING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE TO SELL REAL PROPERTY WITHOUT RETURN OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN04; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCode: CCRMPF; Description: COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND WAIVER OF GENERAL INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT AND ANNUAL AND FINAL ACCOUNTING; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCode: PROBATE; Description: PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROBATE INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: PROBATE(PROBATE); Disposed: Pending.

    Read MoreRead Less