This case was last updated from Garfield County Courts on 07/17/2021 at 14:35:50 (UTC).

ERIN LEA LAND, Plaintiff, v. MORTON CHIROPRACTIC, PLLC, ST. JOHN MEDICAL OWASSO HOSPITAL, ST. JOHN PHYSICIANS, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 08/22/2018 ERIN LEA LAND, Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against MORTON CHIROPRACTIC, PLLC, ST JOHN MEDICAL OWASSO HOSPITAL, ST JOHN PHYSICIANS, Defendant. This case was filed in Garfield County Courts, Garfield County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Woodward, Paul K. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-150

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Garfield, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Woodward, Paul K

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAND, ERIN LEA

Defendants

MORTON CHIROPRACTIC, PLLC

ST. JOHN MEDICAL OWASSO HOSPITAL

ST. JOHN PHYSICIANS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERTS, MICHAEL D

205 West Maple Avesuite 806

Enid, OK 73701

Defendant Attorney

Weathers, Sabre N

10924 Nw Expressway

Yukon, OK 73099

 

Court Documents

PETITION

08/22/2018: PETITION

SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

08/22/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

08/22/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

08/22/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

ORDER

08/23/2018: ORDER

ANSWER

09/04/2018: ANSWER

ANSWER

09/04/2018: ANSWER

ANSWER

09/04/2018: ANSWER

ANSWER

09/04/2018: ANSWER

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

09/04/2018: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

ORDER

10/19/2018: ORDER

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

10/26/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

ORDER OF DISBURSEMENT

11/21/2018: ORDER OF DISBURSEMENT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2018
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: FINAL ORDER; Judge; Party Details; Defendant: ST. JOHN PHYSICIANS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: FINAL ORDER; Judge; Party Details; Defendant: ST. JOHN MEDICAL OWASSO HOSPITAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: FINAL ORDER; Judge; Party Details; Defendant: MORTON CHIROPRACTIC, PLLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: FINAL ORDER; Judge; Party Details; Plaintiff: LAND, ERIN LEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER OF DISBURSEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketCode: DISPFO; Description: ORDER OF DISBURSEMENT GRANTED, PER ORDER; Count: 1; Party: ST. JOHN PHYSICIANS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketCode: DISPFO; Description: ORDER OF DISBURSEMENT GRANTED, PER ORDER; Count: 1; Party: ST. JOHN MEDICAL OWASSO HOSPITAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketCode: DISPFO; Description: ORDER OF DISBURSEMENT GRANTED, PER ORDER; Count: 1; Party: MORTON CHIROPRACTIC, PLLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketCode: DISPFO; Description: ORDER OF DISBURSEMENT GRANTED, PER ORDER; Count: 1; Party: LAND, ERIN LEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE WOODWARD: BENCH DKT: PLTF/ROBERTS; DEFT/WEATHERS; ORDER OF DISBURSEMENT GRANTED, PER ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketCode: INTERP; Description: INTERPLEADER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL MISC. INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INTERPLEADER(INTERP); Filed By: LAND, ERIN LEA

    Read MoreRead Less