This case was last updated from Muskogee County Courts on 04/13/2022 at 11:24:34 (UTC).

ERIC RODGERS V. LAKEESHA MARIE COXUM

Case Summary

On 08/29/2018 ERIC RODGERS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LAKEESHA MARIE COXUM. This case was filed in Muskogee County Courts, Muskogee County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is STOUT, WELDON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0941

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Muskogee, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

STOUT, WELDON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODGERS, ERIC

Defendant

COXUM, LAKEESHA MARIE

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF WAIVER OF JURY TRIAL (SMALL CLAIMS)

08/29/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF WAIVER OF JURY TRIAL (SMALL CLAIMS)

SHERIFFS RETURN

09/14/2018: SHERIFFS RETURN

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2018
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • HearingEvent: NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT $1456

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: $1,348.00 + COSTS; ORDER TO VACATE. WS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JUDGMENT GRANTED TO PLAIN IN THE AMOUNT OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM/ PLAIN APPEARS/PRO SE; DEFENDANT APPEARS/PRO SE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SHERIFFS RETURN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE ALIAS SUMMONS. WS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM/PLAIN APPEARS/PRO SE; DEFENDANT WAS NOT SERVED;

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 2.70

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -1.24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED; Amount: $ -1.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF WAIVER OF JURY TRIAL (SMALL CLAIMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SMALL CLAIMS AFFIDAVIT & ORDER ISSUED SHERIFF IN COUNTY; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT AND SUMMONS; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less