This case was last updated from Pittsburg County Courts on 04/13/2022 at 05:48:34 (UTC).

EMORY HILTON V. JAMIE GUTZMER

Case Summary

On 08/24/2021 EMORY HILTON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JAMIE GUTZMER. This case was filed in Pittsburg County Courts, Pittsburg County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is MCLAUGHLIN, BRIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0473

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pittsburg, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

MCLAUGHLIN, BRIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HILTON, EMORY

Defendant

GUTZMER, JAMIE

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

08/24/2021: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • HearingEvent: SETTLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FROM PUBLIC RECORD. S/MCLAUGHLIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: TO BE FILED. COURT CLERK TO REDACT DEFENDANT'S ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JUDGMENT 9-13-21: CASE ANNOUNCED AS SETTLED. DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SERVED ON 8-26-21 BY PCSO DEPUTY E.BROWN C-16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURN SMALL CLAIMS AFFIDAVIT WITH PROOF OF SERVICE; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 2.71

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -1.25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED; Amount: $ -1.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUED TO SHERIFF; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less