This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 01/15/2023 at 11:02:46 (UTC).

EMMA GWIN V. NATHAN THOMAS HOLLAND

Case Summary

On 01/17/2020 EMMA GWIN filed an Other lawsuit against NATHAN THOMAS HOLLAND. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is MCDANIEL, TRACY L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0009

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

MCDANIEL, TRACY L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GWIN, EMMA

Defendant

HOLLAND, NATHAN THOMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LINDSEY, MAEVE P.

316 N Broadway

Shawnee, OK 74801

 

Court Documents

FILE ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR 1-30-2020 AT

01/17/2020: FILE ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR 1-30-2020 AT

FILE CM - PL PR PRO SE, DEF PR PRO SE, NEW EPO TO

01/31/2020: FILE CM - PL PR PRO SE, DEF PR PRO SE, NEW EPO TO

FILE RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED 1-30-2020

02/03/2020: FILE RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED 1-30-2020

FILE MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL

10/07/2021: FILE MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL

FILE ORDER FOR HEARING ON - 12-9-2021 @9AM

11/02/2021: FILE ORDER FOR HEARING ON - 12-9-2021 @9AM

FILE ORDER FOR HEARING ON - 12-9-2021 @9AM

11/02/2021: FILE ORDER FOR HEARING ON - 12-9-2021 @9AM

FILE CERTIFIED MAIL GREEN CARD

11/22/2021: FILE CERTIFIED MAIL GREEN CARD

FILE PETITIIONERS OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR

12/09/2021: FILE PETITIIONERS OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR

FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FOR THE PLAIN

12/09/2021: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FOR THE PLAIN

FILE CM

12/09/2021: FILE CM

FILE ORDER FOR NEW TRIAL

01/24/2022: FILE ORDER FOR NEW TRIAL

FILE ORDER FOR HEARING - MATTER SET FOR TRIAL 3-3-22 AT

02/22/2022: FILE ORDER FOR HEARING - MATTER SET FOR TRIAL 3-3-22 AT

FILE CM: PLF PRESENT BY M. LINDSEY, DEF PRESENT W/ G

06/30/2022: FILE CM: PLF PRESENT BY M. LINDSEY, DEF PRESENT W/ G

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2022
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSED/SETTLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -1.66

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -2.48

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 85.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less