This case was last updated from Payne County Courts on 01/07/2022 at 07:35:34 (UTC).

Elmore, Marvin Jermel Jr v. Oklahoma Department of Public Safety

Case Summary

On 07/16/2018 Elmore, Marvin Jermel Jr filed an Other lawsuit against Oklahoma Department of Public Safety. This case was filed in Payne County Courts, Payne County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Corley, Phillip C.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-360

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Payne, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Corley, Phillip C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elmore, Marvin

Defendant

Oklahoma Department of Public Safety

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Swafford, Thomas Arlin II

Po Box 2224311 South Duck Street (74074)

Stillwater, OK 74076

Murray, James Von

Po Box 2224311 South Duck (74074)

Stillwater, OK 74076

Defendant Attorney

Downs, Myriah S

Oklahoma Department Of Public Safetypo Box 11415

Oklahoma City, OK 73136

 

Court Documents

PETITION

07/16/2018: PETITION

CASH APPEAL BOND

07/16/2018: CASH APPEAL BOND

CASH BOND

07/16/2018: CASH BOND

ATTORNEY STATEMENT REGARDING IGNITION INTERLOCK DEVICE

07/16/2018: ATTORNEY STATEMENT REGARDING IGNITION INTERLOCK DEVICE

ORDER SETTING HEARING

07/16/2018: ORDER SETTING HEARING

FINAL ORDER (JUDGE CORLEY)

08/06/2018: FINAL ORDER (JUDGE CORLEY)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketCode: DISBURSED; Description: VOUCHER# 13383 PRINTED TO JAMES V MURRAY, ESQUIRE, WHICH INCLUDES $ 250.00 FROM THIS CASE FOR AC90 - CASH BONDS. TOTAL AMOUNT OF VOUCHER: $ 250.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: REQUESTED VOUCHER IN AMOUNT OF 250.00 TO JAMES V MURRAY, ESQUIRE, ATTORNEY, PO BOX 2224, STILLWATER, OK 74076 (REFUND CASH BOND) FROM ACCOUNT AC90. DISBURSEMENT NUMBER 2046226.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: FINAL ORDER; Judge; Party Details; Plaintiff: Elmore, Marvin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: FO; Description: FINAL ORDER (JUDGE CORLEY); Party: Elmore, Marvin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • HearingEvent: Modification of suspension of driver's license; Party: Elmore,Marvin; Docket: Phillip C. Corley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JUDGE CORLEY: THIS CASE COMES BEFORE THE COURT FOR MODIFICATION OF SUSPENSION OF DRIVER'S LICENSE. PLAIN APPEARS BY COUNSEL. AN AGREED ORDER IS SUBMITTED.; Party: Elmore, Marvin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2018-578580 ON 07/16/2018. PAYOR: JAMES MURRAY FOR ELMORE, MARVIN TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 404.14. LINE ITEMS: CJ-2018-360: $85.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CJ-2018-360: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. CJ-2018-360: $1.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2018-360: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CJ-2018-360: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2018-360: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. CJ-2018-360: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CJ-2018-360: $2.48 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2018-360: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2018-360: $10.00 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. CJ-2018-360: $10.00 ON AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY. CJ-2018-360: $250.00 ON AC90 CASH BONDS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE CORLEY, PHILLIP C. TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER SETTING HEARING; Party: Elmore, Marvin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ATTORNEY STATEMENT REGARDING IGNITION INTERLOCK DEVICE; Party: Elmore, Marvin

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketCode: APPLDL; Description: APPLICATION RE: REVOCATION OF DRIVERS LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: APPLICATION RE: REVOCATION OF DRIVERS LICENSE(APPLDL); Filed By: Elmore, Marvin

    Read MoreRead Less