This case was last updated from Kiowa County Courts on 06/11/2022 at 02:10:04 (UTC).

ELIZABETH MCGILL V. WILLIAM ALLEN, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 09/11/2018 ELIZABETH MCGILL filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against WILLIAM ALLEN,. This case was filed in Kiowa County Courts, Kiowa County Courthouse located in Seminole, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is RUSSELL, NORMAN L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0029

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Kiowa, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

RUSSELL, NORMAN L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCGILL, ELIZABETH

Defendants

ALLEN, WILLIAM

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ELLIOTT, NICHOLAS

14000 Quail Springs Pkwy

Oklahoma City, OK 73134

SOUTH, ARTHUR R.

802 S.W. D Ave.

Lawton, OK 73501

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OF RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED MOTION ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTE ATTY OF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSED/SETTLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM ASSESSMENT (NEW 7-1-04); Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elliott, Nicholas