This case was last updated from Pontotoc County Courts on 05/06/2022 at 07:08:36 (UTC).

ELDON SAWYERS, ET. AL. V. TERRY DAVIS, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 08/02/2018 ELDON SAWYERS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TERRY DAVIS. This case was filed in Pontotoc County Courts, Pontotoc County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is POLLARD, GREG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0724

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pontotoc, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

POLLARD, GREG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SAWYERS, ELDON

SAWYERS, LINDA

Defendants

DAVIS, MELISSA

DAVIS, TERRY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RET'D WRIT OF ASSITANCE (EXECUTION ON 8-30-2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OFFICE; Amount: $ 33.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE WRIT OF ASSISTANCE TO PONTOTOC CO. SHERIFF'S; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEPOSIT BY LINDA SAWYERS CK $116.64

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DAVIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RET'D AFFIDAVIT & SUMMONS (8-2-18) MELISSA & TERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ISSUE AFFIDAVIT AND SUMMONS TO PLAIN; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEPOSIT BY LINDA SAWYERS CK $58.00

    Read MoreRead Less