This case was last updated from Kay County Courts on 05/23/2022 at 05:21:11 (UTC).

EDWIN JOSEPH URBAN V. VICKI JO ROOT

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 EDWIN JOSEPH URBAN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against VICKI JO ROOT. This case was filed in Kay County Courts, Kay County Courthouse - Newkirk Division located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is WILKIE, DAVID M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0494

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Kay, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

WILKIE, DAVID M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

URBAN, EDWIN JOSEPH

Defendant

ROOT, VICKI JO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

DENTON, DAVID O.

P O Box 459

Blackwell, OK 74631

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR DAMAGES TO PREMISES

11/01/2021: APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR DAMAGES TO PREMISES

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2026
  • HearingEvent: DESTRUCTION REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: S/VICKI ROOT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: S/VICKI ROOT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GARNISHMENT SUMMONS SERVED BY CERT MAIL UNDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GARNISHMENT SUMMONS SERVED BY CERT MAIL UNDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURN OF ORIGINAL CONTINUING POST JUDGMENT EARNINGS; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURN OF ORIGINAL CONTINUING POST JUDGMENT EARNINGS; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CAUSE COMES ON FOR HEARING ON FORCIBLE ENTRY AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM:WILKIE MB/ME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: BY: PERSONAL SERVICE ON SEPTEMBER 19, 2021 BY KAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURN OF ORIGINAL SUMMONS SERVING: VICKI ROOT; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: TO SHERIFF FOR SERVICE; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED TO BE SERVED BY PROCESS SERVER; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT (FORCIBLE ENTRY AND DETAINER); Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less