This case was last updated from Oklahoma County Courts on 03/17/2023 at 08:06:27 (UTC).

Echard, Braden v. Community Hospital LLC

Case Summary

On 05/18/2022 Echard, Braden filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Community Hospital LLC. This case was filed in Oklahoma County Courts, Oklahoma County Courthouse located in Tulsa, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Timmons, Aletia Haynes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2333

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Oklahoma, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Timmons, Aletia Haynes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Echard, Braden

Defendants

Community Hospital LLC

Braly, Brett Alan MD

Brett A Braly MD PLLC

Healthcare Partners Investments Llc

Luttrell, Evan CRNA

Sarvothama Shetty, Satheesh Kumar MD

Stubbs, Lenny Dwayne MD

The Physicians' Group Llc

Hpi Holdings Llc

Hpi Physician Holdco, Llc

Hpi Physicians, Llc

Integris Health, Inc

Integris/usp Health Ventures, Llc

United Surgical Partners International, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Clark, Madison S

Attorney at SLAMA LEGAL GROUP

4301 Southwest Third St. Suite 100

Oklahoma City, OK 73108

SLAMA, JO L

Attorney at SLAMA LEGAL GROUP

4301 Southwest Third Street, Suite 100

Okc, OK 73108

Defendant Attorneys

STEVENS, KIMBERLY A

1109 N. Francis

Oklahoma City, OK 73106

Hendrickson, Russell L

Attorney at Pierce Couch Hendrickson Baysinger & Green

1109 N Francis

Oklahoma City, OK 73106

Rasbold, Andrew J

Attorney at WALTERS STANLEY & NATARAJAN, LLP

1017 Nw 6Th Street

Oklahoma City, OK 73106

HORNBEEK, Mark E

Corporate Tower - 13Th Floor, 101 N Robinson

Okc, OK 73102

Sharpe, G. Calvin

Attorney at Phillips Murrah PC

Corporate Tower, Thirteenth Floor, 101 N Robinson

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

WHITE, AMY D

Corporate Tower 13Th Floor, 101 North Robinson Ave

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

DEWBERRY, ERIN A.

3100 Oklahoma Tower, 210 Park Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

GIN, ANDREW T

3100 Oklahoma Tower, 210 Park Ave

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Judd Fairchild, Lauren N

3100 Oklahoma Tower, 210 Park Avenue

Okc, OK 73102

John Wiggins

3100 Oklahoma Tower, 210 Park Ave.

Okc, OK 73102

BRANSCUM, DAVID

201 Robert S. Kerr Avenue, 12Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Sherry, Patrick B

Attorney at FOLIART, HUFF, OTTOWAY & BOTTOM

201 Robert S Kerr Ave., 12Th Floor

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS PLAIN 'S UNJUST ENRICHMENT (DISENGORGEMENT) CAUSE OF ACTION

03/06/2023: DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS PLAIN 'S UNJUST ENRICHMENT (DISENGORGEMENT) CAUSE OF ACTION

PROOF OF SERVICE 3/3/23 TO ENABLING TECHNOLOGIES LLC BY LEAVING WITH RICHARD RILEY AS SA

03/06/2023: PROOF OF SERVICE 3/3/23 TO ENABLING TECHNOLOGIES LLC BY LEAVING WITH RICHARD RILEY AS SA

AMENDED ANSWER TO THE DEFENDANT, EVAN LUTTRELL, CRNA, TO THE PLAIN 'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION

03/07/2023: AMENDED ANSWER TO THE DEFENDANT, EVAN LUTTRELL, CRNA, TO THE PLAIN 'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT INTEGRIS HEALTH, INC.

03/06/2023: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT INTEGRIS HEALTH, INC.

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT THE PHYSICIANS' GROUP, LLC TO PLAIN 'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION

03/06/2023: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT THE PHYSICIANS' GROUP, LLC TO PLAIN 'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION

ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS BRETT BRALY, M.D. AND BRETT A. BRALY, M.D., PLLC D/B/A THE SPINE CLINIC TO PLAIN 'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION

03/06/2023: ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS BRETT BRALY, M.D. AND BRETT A. BRALY, M.D., PLLC D/B/A THE SPINE CLINIC TO PLAIN 'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF DAVID A. BRANSCUM AND PATRICK R. B. SHERRY ON BEHALF OF THE DEFENDANT INTEGRIS HEALTH, INC

03/06/2023: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF DAVID A. BRANSCUM AND PATRICK R. B. SHERRY ON BEHALF OF THE DEFENDANT INTEGRIS HEALTH, INC

ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO STRIKE SCHEDULING ORDER AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE DATE OF MAY 17, 2023

03/03/2023: ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO STRIKE SCHEDULING ORDER AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE DATE OF MAY 17, 2023

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FOR DEFENDANTS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, LLC HEALTHCARE PARTNERS INVESTMENTS , LLC HPI PHYSICIANS , LLC HPI HOLDINGS, LLC HPI PHYSICIAN HOLDCO, LLC INTEGRIS/USP HEALTH VENTURES, LLC D/B/A INTEGRIS/USPI HEALTH VENTURES, LLC AND UNITED SU

03/02/2023: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FOR DEFENDANTS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, LLC HEALTHCARE PARTNERS INVESTMENTS , LLC HPI PHYSICIANS , LLC HPI HOLDINGS, LLC HPI PHYSICIAN HOLDCO, LLC INTEGRIS/USP HEALTH VENTURES, LLC D/B/A INTEGRIS/USPI HEALTH VENTURES, LLC AND UNITED SURGICAL PARTNERS INTERNATIONAL, INC.

DEFENDANTS' JOINT PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS PLAIN 'S INJUST ENRICHMENT ( DISGORGEMENT) CAUSE OF ACTION

03/02/2023: DEFENDANTS' JOINT PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS PLAIN 'S INJUST ENRICHMENT ( DISGORGEMENT) CAUSE OF ACTION

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT UNITED SURGICAL PARTNERS INTERNATIONAL INC TO PLAIN 'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION

03/02/2023: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT UNITED SURGICAL PARTNERS INTERNATIONAL INC TO PLAIN 'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT HPI HOLDINGS, LLC TO PLAIN 'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION

03/02/2023: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT HPI HOLDINGS, LLC TO PLAIN 'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT HEALTHCARE PARTNERS INVESTMENTS LLC TO PLAIN 'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION

03/02/2023: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT HEALTHCARE PARTNERS INVESTMENTS LLC TO PLAIN 'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT HPI PHYSICIAN HOLDCO, LLC TO PLAIN 'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION

03/02/2023: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT HPI PHYSICIAN HOLDCO, LLC TO PLAIN 'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, LLC TO PLAIN 'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION

03/02/2023: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, LLC TO PLAIN 'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT INTEGRIS/USP HEALTH VENTURES, LLC D/B/A INTEGRIS/USPI HEALTH VENTURES, LLC TO PLAIN 'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION

03/02/2023: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT INTEGRIS/USP HEALTH VENTURES, LLC D/B/A INTEGRIS/USPI HEALTH VENTURES, LLC TO PLAIN 'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT LENNY DWAYNE STUBBS, M.D., TO PLAIN 'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION

03/02/2023: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT LENNY DWAYNE STUBBS, M.D., TO PLAIN 'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT HPI PHYSICIANS, LLC TO PLAIN 'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION

03/02/2023: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT HPI PHYSICIANS, LLC TO PLAIN 'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION

74 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2023
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Docket: Aletia Haynes Timmons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • HearingEvent: DEFENDANT;S JOINT PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS PLAIN 'S UNJUST ENRICHMENT ( DISGORGEMENT) CAUSE OF ACTION; Docket: Aletia Haynes Timmons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AM; Description: AMENDED ANSWER TO THE DEFENDANT, EVAN LUTTRELL, CRNA, TO THE PLAIN 'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MOD; Description: DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS PLAIN 'S UNJUST ENRICHMENT (DISENGORGEMENT) CAUSE OF ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: POS; Description: PROOF OF SERVICE 3/3/23 TO ENABLING TECHNOLOGIES LLC BY LEAVING WITH RICHARD RILEY AS SA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT INTEGRIS HEALTH, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT THE PHYSICIANS' GROUP, LLC TO PLAIN 'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS BRETT BRALY, M.D. AND BRETT A. BRALY, M.D., PLLC D/B/A THE SPINE CLINIC TO PLAIN 'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: EAA; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF DAVID A. BRANSCUM AND PATRICK R. B. SHERRY ON BEHALF OF THE DEFENDANT INTEGRIS HEALTH, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO STRIKE SCHEDULING ORDER AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE DATE OF MAY 17, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
98 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCode: DEATH; Description: WRONGFUL DEATH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: WRONGFUL DEATH(DEATH); Filed By: Echard, Braden; Disposed: Pending.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less