This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 02/27/2023 at 13:27:39 (UTC).

E-Z AUTO FINANCE, INC. V. MALIK DAVID TATE

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 E-Z AUTO FINANCE, INC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against MALIK DAVID TATE. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Tulsa, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0034

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

E-Z AUTO FINANCE, INC.

Defendant

TATE, MALIK DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

FUDGE, HUGH

119 N Robinson Ave, Suite 1000

Okc, OK 73110

 

Court Documents

FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

02/17/2023: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

02/17/2023: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

02/09/2023: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

02/06/2023: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

01/23/2023: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

01/17/2023: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

01/06/2023: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

01/03/2023: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

12/28/2022: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

12/19/2022: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

12/19/2022: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

12/05/2022: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

11/21/2022: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

FILE GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT -LOVE'S TRAVEL STOPS

11/16/2022: FILE GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT -LOVE'S TRAVEL STOPS

FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

11/15/2022: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

11/07/2022: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

10/31/2022: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

10/24/2022: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
112 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION (OVER $10,000.); Amount: $ 163.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less