This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 02/08/2023 at 01:41:46 (UTC).

E-Z AUTO FINANCE, INC. V. KRYSTAL STOUT

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 E-Z AUTO FINANCE, INC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against KRYSTAL STOUT. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0061

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

E-Z AUTO FINANCE, INC.

Defendant

STOUT, KRYSTAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

FUDGE, HUGH

119 N Robinson Ave, Suite 1000

Okc, OK 73110

 

Court Documents

FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

12/29/2022: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

FILE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

12/21/2022: FILE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

FILE ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSE TO GARNISHMENT SUMMONS

11/22/2022: FILE ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSE TO GARNISHMENT SUMMONS

FILE APPLICATION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO GARNISHMENT

11/22/2022: FILE APPLICATION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO GARNISHMENT

FILE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

01/12/2022: FILE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

FILE ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSE TO GARNISHMENT SUMMONS

01/06/2022: FILE ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSE TO GARNISHMENT SUMMONS

FILE APPLICATION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO GARNISHMENT

01/06/2022: FILE APPLICATION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO GARNISHMENT

FILE GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT - CHAD SHEPHARD INSURANCE

09/17/2021: FILE GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT - CHAD SHEPHARD INSURANCE

FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

05/10/2021: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

FILE GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT - BEST BUY STORES, L.P.

04/19/2021: FILE GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT - BEST BUY STORES, L.P.

FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

04/16/2021: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

04/05/2021: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

03/22/2021: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

03/11/2021: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

03/11/2021: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

02/25/2021: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

02/05/2021: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

01/22/2021: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSE TO GARNISHMENT SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE APPLICATION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO GARNISHMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION (UNDER $10,000.); Amount: $ 150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less