This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 02/08/2023 at 02:49:51 (UTC).

E-Z AUTO FINANCE, INC. V. JACK CARL ROBBINS

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 E-Z AUTO FINANCE, INC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against JACK CARL ROBBINS. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0057

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

E-Z AUTO FINANCE, INC.

Defendant

ROBBINS, JACK CARL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

FUDGE, HUGH

119 N Robinson Ave, Suite 1000

Okc, OK 73110

 

Court Documents

FILE PETITION (UNDER $10,000.)

01/22/2020: FILE PETITION (UNDER $10,000.)

FILE APPLICATION FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF

01/22/2020: FILE APPLICATION FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF

FILE SUMMONS & RETURN- NOT FOUND

04/30/2020: FILE SUMMONS & RETURN- NOT FOUND

FILE ATTORNEY'S AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

05/18/2020: FILE ATTORNEY'S AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

FILE NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

05/18/2020: FILE NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

06/16/2020: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

FILE MOTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHOUT NOTICE

09/01/2020: FILE MOTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHOUT NOTICE

FILE JUDGMENT

09/01/2020: FILE JUDGMENT

FILE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

09/25/2020: FILE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

FILE GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT -A1 STAFFING & RECURITING

10/15/2020: FILE GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT -A1 STAFFING & RECURITING

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE GARN. SUMM.; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT -A1 STAFFING & RECURITING; Amount: $ 63.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION (UNDER $10,000.); Amount: $ 150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less