This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 03/01/2023 at 02:28:53 (UTC).

E-Z AUTO FINANCE, INC. V. CARL MILLER JR

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 E-Z AUTO FINANCE, INC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against CARL MILLER JR. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Tulsa, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0054

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

E-Z AUTO FINANCE, INC.

Defendant

MILLER, CARL JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

FUDGE, HUGH

119 N Robinson Ave, Suite 1000

Okc, OK 73110

 

Court Documents

FILE PETITION (UNDER $10,000.)

01/22/2020: FILE PETITION (UNDER $10,000.)

FILE APPLICATION FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF

01/22/2020: FILE APPLICATION FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF

FILE SUMMONS AND RETURN - CARL MILLER, JR. NOT FOUND

05/13/2020: FILE SUMMONS AND RETURN - CARL MILLER, JR. NOT FOUND

FILE ATTORNEY'S OF DUE DILIGENCE

06/10/2020: FILE ATTORNEY'S OF DUE DILIGENCE

FILE NOTICE BY PUBLICAITON

06/10/2020: FILE NOTICE BY PUBLICAITON

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

07/06/2020: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

FILE MOTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHOUT NOTICE

09/25/2020: FILE MOTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHOUT NOTICE

FILE JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

09/25/2020: FILE JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

FILE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

10/15/2020: FILE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE MOTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHOUT NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE NOTICE BY PUBLICAITON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ATTORNEY'S OF DUE DILIGENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE SUMMONS AND RETURN - CARL MILLER, JR. NOT FOUND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION (UNDER $10,000.); Amount: $ 150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less