This case was last updated from Marshall County Courts on 05/17/2022 at 07:44:52 (UTC).

DUPLEXES OF MADILL V. JAMES LOUIS SOTO, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 DUPLEXES OF MADILL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JAMES LOUIS SOTO. This case was filed in Marshall County Courts, Marshall County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHNSON, GREGORY L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0033

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Marshall, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

JOHNSON, GREGORY L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUPLEXES OF MADILL

Defendants

SOTO, JAMES LOUIS

SOTO, AMBER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2021
  • HearingEvent: STATUS REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • HearingEvent: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMARY ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • HearingEvent: FORCIBLE ENTRY AND DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMARY ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: EVICTION PROTECTION DECLARATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • HearingEvent: FORCIBLE ENTRY AND DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMARY ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED MCSO/JAMES & AMBER SOTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CARES ACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: VERIFICATION OF COMPLIANCE WITH SECTION 4024 OF THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS IMCSO JAMES & AMBER SOTO; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less