This case was last updated from Haskell County Courts on 04/21/2022 at 01:51:46 (UTC).

DON PARSONS V. JEFFERY L. TRICKETT SR., ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 DON PARSONS filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against JEFFERY L TRICKETT SR . This case was filed in Haskell County Courts, Haskell County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is HENDERSON, BRIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0003

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Haskell, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

HENDERSON, BRIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARSONS, DON

Defendants

TRICKETT, JEFFERY L. SR.

TRICKETT, JEFFREY L. JR.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CONKLIN & SANDERS PLLC

Attorney at CONKLIN & SANDERS PLLC

202 N. Broadway, P.O. Box 571

Stigler, OK 74462

BLANKENSHIP, CHRIS

Po Box 69

Stigler, OK 74462

 

Court Documents

DEFS' SPECIAL APPEARANCE, RESPONSE TO PLAIN 'S

04/20/2022: DEFS' SPECIAL APPEARANCE, RESPONSE TO PLAIN 'S

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2022
  • HearingEvent: HEARING DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MECHANIC LIEN FUNDS TO PLAIN AND MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTION FOR COURT ORDER FOR COUNTY CLERK TO RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEFS' SPECIAL APPEARANCE, RESPONSE TO PLAIN 'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER FOR HEARING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MECHANIC LIEN FUNDS TO PLAIN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTION FOR COURT ORDER FOR COUNTY CLERK TO RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FILED; Amount: $ 23.00

    Read MoreRead Less