This case was last updated from Haskell County Courts on 12/01/2022 at 19:50:12 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK V. RETA FITZER

Case Summary

On 07/26/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against RETA FITZER. This case was filed in Haskell County Courts, Haskell County Courthouse located in Seminole, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is HENDERSON, BRIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0070

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Haskell, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

HENDERSON, BRIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

FITZER, RETA

Stigler, OK 74462-3520

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTORNEY

07/26/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTORNEY

FILE AND ENTER PETITION CIVIL 10,000 OR LESS

07/26/2021: FILE AND ENTER PETITION CIVIL 10,000 OR LESS

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED

09/10/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED

ORDER FILED (DISPOSTRICKEN 2-22 JT)

12/08/2021: ORDER FILED (DISPOSTRICKEN 2-22 JT)

ANSWER FILED

12/09/2021: ANSWER FILED

AFFIDAVIT AS TO NON-MILITARY SERVICE

01/31/2022: AFFIDAVIT AS TO NON-MILITARY SERVICE

FILE AND ENTER MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

02/02/2022: FILE AND ENTER MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE FILED

02/02/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE FILED

CONSENT JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED

04/21/2022: CONSENT JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING JOURNAL ENTRY FILED

05/20/2022: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING JOURNAL ENTRY FILED

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED

06/09/2022: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING JOURNAL ENTRY FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CONSENT JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Amount: $ 50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ANSWER FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • HearingEvent: DISP. DOCKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER FILED (DISPO;STRICKEN 2-22 JT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PDLTF; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CHSC FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER PETITION CIVIL 10,000 OR LESS; Amount: $ 150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less